PA HB1135 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-8)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 197
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-8)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 197
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge that carries State Route 153 over the Bennett Branch in Huston Township, Clearfield County, as the Huston Township Veterans Memorial Bridge; designating U.S. Route 219 in Johnsonburg Borough, Elk County, from the intersection of State Route 1009, Center Street, starting at roadway segment 0502 offset 0000 to the intersection of State Route 1009, Center Street, ending at roadway segment 0522 offset 1159, as the Veterans of Johnsonburg Bypass; designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 1001 between Rhawn Street, 0100/0000 and Kendrick Street, 0100/2784 in the City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia County, as the Firefighter Daniel Sweeney Memorial Highway; designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 611 between Maple Avenue and Meetinghouse Road, in Montgomery County, as the Lieutenant Joseph C. Park II Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 272 in Lancaster County, south of State Route 372 and before Osceola Road, as the Staff Sergeant Keith A. Bennett Memorial Highway; designating a portion of U.S. Route 1, City Avenue in Philadelphia and Montgomery Counties from its intersection with Presidential Boulevard to its intersection with Monument Road as Ed Bradley Way; providing for the redesignation of the Easton-Phillipsburg Toll Bridge operated by the Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Commission as the Sergeant William John Cahir Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of PA Route 191 in Washington Township, Northampton County, as the "World War II Homefront Heroes Highway"; renaming the Hokendauqua Bridge in Lehigh County as the Lieutenant Colonel Thomas J. Lynch Memorial Bridge; renaming the Main Street Bridge in Brockway Borough, Jefferson County, as the Ensign USN Connie Rita Esposito Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge carrying State Route 1008 known as Pompey Hill Road, over the Stonycreek River in Quemahoning and Stonycreek Townships, Somerset County, as the Private John W. Mostoller Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 271 over the South Branch Blacklick Creek, Nanty Glo Borough, Cambria County, as the Platoon Sergeant Alfred McCullough Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 181 over the Conewago Creek, between Newberry Township and East Manchester Township, York County, as the SP4 Randy Stephen Schell Memorial Bridge; and designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 144 in Centre County as the PFC Donald Ray Lucas Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a bridge that carries State Route 153 over the Bennett Branch in Huston Township, Clearfield County, as the Huston Township Veterans Memorial Bridge; designating U.S. Route 219 in Johnsonburg Borough, Elk County, from the intersection of State Route 1009, Center Street, starting at roadway segment 0502 offset 0000 to the intersection of State Route 1009, Center Street, ending at roadway segment 0522 offset 1159, as the Veterans of Johnsonburg Bypass; designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 1001 between Rhawn Street, 0100/0000 and Kendrick Street, 0100/2784 in the City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia County, as the Firefighter Daniel Sweeney Memorial Highway; designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 611 between Maple Avenue and Meetinghouse Road, in Montgomery County, as the Lieutenant Joseph C. Park II Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 272 in Lancaster County, south of State Route 372 and before Osceola Road, as the Staff Sergeant Keith A. Bennett Memorial Highway; designating a portion of U.S. Route 1, City Avenue in Philadelphia and Montgomery Counties from its intersection with Presidential Boulevard to its intersection with Monument Road as Ed Bradley Way; providing for the redesignation of the Easton-Phillipsburg Toll Bridge operated by the Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Commission as the Sergeant William John Cahir Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of PA Route 191 in Washington Township, Northampton County, as the "World War II Homefront Heroes Highway"; renaming the Hokendauqua Bridge in Lehigh County as the Lieutenant Colonel Thomas J. Lynch Memorial Bridge; renaming the Main Street Bridge in Brockway Borough, Jefferson County, as the Ensign USN Connie Rita Esposito Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge carrying State Route 1008 known as Pompey Hill Road, over the Stonycreek River in Quemahoning and Stonycreek Townships, Somerset County, as the Private John W. Mostoller Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 271 over the South Branch Blacklick Creek, Nanty Glo Borough, Cambria County, as the Platoon Sergeant Alfred McCullough Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 181 over the Conewago Creek, between Newberry Township and East Manchester Township, York County, as the SP4 Randy Stephen Schell Memorial Bridge; and designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 144 in Centre County as the PFC Donald Ray Lucas Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-23 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Act No. 197 |
2014-10-31 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-20 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (196-0) |
2014-10-20 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-16 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-15 | House | In the House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-05-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2014-05-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-05-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-05-06 | House | Second consideration |
2014-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-30 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |