PA HB1020 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-25 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-25 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for powers and duties of the Pennsylvania Emergency Management Agency and for disbursement of fund amounts by agency.
Title
Further providing for powers and duties of the Pennsylvania Emergency Management Agency and for disbursement of fund amounts by agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-15 - House - HB 1020 PN 4187, FP (Y: 191 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-03 - House - HB 1020 PN 4066, 2011 A13264, PAYTON (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-03 - House - HB 1020 PN 4066, 2011 A13264, PAYTON (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-25 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2012-10-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-10-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-3) |
2012-10-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-03 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-10-02 | House | Removed from table |
2012-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2012-09-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-03-14 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |