OR SCR211 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Remembers the life of Steve Druckenmiller and honors him in his death. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.7). In memoriam: Steve Druckenmiller, 1950-2023.
Title
In memoriam: Steve Druckenmiller, 1950-2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Read. Carried by Cate. Adopted. Ayes, 52; Excused, 5--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Cramer, Neron, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Fahey, Ruiz, Speaker Rayfield. |
2024-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2024-03-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-02-29 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2024-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Adopted. Ayes, 30. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |