OR SB1585 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases fees to obtain nursing license by indorsement. Directs that moneys in Oregon Nursing Advancement Fund be remitted quarterly to nonprofit organization that supports advancement of nursing profession in Oregon. Permits Department of Human Services to make payments to certain long term care facilities that purchase long term care bed capacity between October 1, 2013, and June 30, 2016. Allows department to adopt rules relating to purchase of long term care bed capacity. Permits department to establish reimbursement rate for certain pediatric care services. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state finance; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 113, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Nearman, Post, Sprenger, Weidner; Excused, 2--Davis, Olson. |
2016-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Gelser granted unanimous consent to change vote from nay to aye. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen, Shields, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Hansell, Winters. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |