OR HB4114 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces personal income tax rates by modifying income tax brackets. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2016. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to revenue; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2016R1/Measures/Overview/HB4114 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2016R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4114/Introduced |