OR HB3262 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Chapter 142, (2013 Laws): Effective date May 16, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Chapter 142, (2013 Laws): Effective date May 16, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Fish and Wildlife Commission to issue permits for removal of certain crab pots.
Title
Relating to crab pots; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Chapter 142, (2013 Laws): Effective date May 16, 2013. |
2013-05-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-03-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Krieger. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Johnson, Kennemer, Matthews, Olson, Weidner. |
2013-03-12 | House | Second reading. |
2013-03-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |