OR HB2669 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements for local community right to know regulatory programs for toxic substances and harmful substances.
Title
Relating to community right to know regulatory programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] |
Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Barbara Warner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2669 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2669/Introduced |