OR HB2669 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-13 - Chapter 379, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 13, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Extends certain employee protections to interns performing work for educational purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to employee protections; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-13HouseChapter 379, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 13, 2013.
2013-06-13HouseGovernor signed.
2013-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2013-06-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-06-04SenateThird reading. Carried by George. Passed. Ayes, 30.
2013-06-03SenateSecond reading.
2013-06-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2013-05-24SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2013-05-17SenateReferred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection.
2013-05-16SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2013-05-15HouseThird reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Fagan.
2013-05-14HouseSecond reading.
2013-05-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2013-05-10HouseWork Session held.
2013-04-24HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2013-04-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Rules.
2013-04-17HouseWork Session held.
2013-04-10HouseWork Session held.
2013-04-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2013-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback