OR HB2447 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Chapter 84, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Chapter 84, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that declarations of Department of Human Services or Oregon Health Authority relating to deceased depositors of certain financial institutions must be made within specified time period. Provides that declarations of Department of Human Services or Oregon Health Authority relating to deceased depositors of certain financial institutions must be made within specified time period.
Title
Relating to agency declarations relating to deceased depositors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Chapter 84, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024. |
2023-05-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-05-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-05-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Hansell, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 12--Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Hansell, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 2--Girod, Gorsek. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reynolds. Passed. Ayes, 50; Excused, 9--Breese-Iverson, Chaichi, Cramer, Gamba, Hartman, Helfrich, Kropf, Marsh, Nelson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Mannix. |
2023-02-23 | House | Carried over to February 28, 2023 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2023-02-21 | House | Second reading. |
2023-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |