OR HB2086 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 231, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 231, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows correction of maximum assessed value due to new property or new improvements to property erroneously added to tax roll for current tax year and up to five preceding tax years. Allows correction of maximum assessed value due to new property or new improvements to property erroneously added to tax roll for current tax year and up to five preceding tax years. Requires annual tax statement to include notice in cases of increase of more than three percent of property's assessed value and reason for increase] information about contacting county assessor if property's assessed value increased more than three percent over prior tax year. Makes correction of certain errors on assessment and tax roll mandatory. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to property tax assessment; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-24 | House | Chapter 231, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023. |
2023-07-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-03-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Dexter, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Ruiz. |
2023-03-27 | House | Second reading. |
2023-03-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-03-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-14 | House | Informational Meeting held. |
2023-02-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |