OK SCR7 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR7
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-7)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-7)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution designating cotton as the State Fiber of Oklahoma; recognizing its impact in the state; thanking farmers; and directing distribution.
Title
Resolution designating cotton as the State Fiber of Oklahoma; recognizing its impact in the state; thanking farmers; and directing distribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-19 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kerbs |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered |
2021-04-19 | House | Introduced |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Coauthored by all other Senators except Matthews, Young |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) (principal House author) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kidd |
2021-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SCR7 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Filed with Secretary of State