OK SCR23 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 109-40)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 109-40)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution; honoring the life and achievements of Oklahoma-born ballerina, Maria Tallchief; mourning her passing; expressing condolences to her family.
Title
Concurrent Resolution; honoring the life and achievements of Oklahoma-born ballerina, Maria Tallchief; mourning her passing; expressing condolences to her family.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2013-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-14 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate |
2013-05-14 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered |
2013-04-22 | House | Introduced |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | coauthored by all other Senators |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Considered |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2013-04-17 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2013-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |