OK SB573 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Charter schools; creating the Public Charter School Accountability and Authorization Act; providing charter school application procedures. Effective date.
Title
Charter schools; creating the Public Charter School Accountability and Authorization Act; providing charter school application procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 43 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 28 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 28 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | Motion expired |
2014-04-24 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Reynolds |
2014-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 64 |
2014-04-24 | House | Title stricken |
2014-04-24 | House | Amended |
2014-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Newell, Turner |
2014-04-24 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson |
2014-04-10 | House | Remove Representative Nelson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Denney |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | Withdrawn from Common Education Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 15 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 134 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 135 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 136 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 137 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 139 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 140 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 142 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 143 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 145 | New Code | See Bill Text |