OK SB550 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Unfair Sales Act; limiting unfair sales provisions of covered merchandise. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unfair Sales Act; limiting unfair sales provisions of covered merchandise. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-21 - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 65 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate: ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-24SenateApproved by Governor 05/24/2013
2013-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2013-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2013-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2013-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2013-05-21HouseTo Senate
2013-05-21HouseMeasure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 15
2013-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2013-05-15HouseCCR submitted
2013-05-15SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 16
2013-05-15SenateAyes: 33 Nays: 11
2013-05-15SenateCCR adopted
2013-05-14SenateCCR read
2013-05-07HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2013-04-30SenateSCs named Holt, Newberry, Ford, Johnson (Rob), Shumate, Paddack
2013-04-29SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2013-04-18Senatecoauthored by Sharp
2013-04-18Senatecoauthored by Cockroft
2013-04-18SenateHAs read
2013-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 23
2013-04-17HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hall, Walker
2013-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2013-04-15HouseTitle restored
2013-04-15HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2013-04-08HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Committee
2013-04-08HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2013-03-14HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2013-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2013-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2013-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-03-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 15
2013-03-06SenateTitle stricken
2013-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2013-02-14SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2013-02-05Senatecoauthored by Newell (principal House author)
2013-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2013-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Holt
2013-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
155981New CodeSee Bill Text
155982New CodeSee Bill Text
155983New CodeSee Bill Text
155984New CodeSee Bill Text
155985New CodeSee Bill Text
155986New CodeSee Bill Text
155987New CodeSee Bill Text
155988New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback