OK SB349 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB349
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Dahm
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Dahm
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Animals; which relates to the Commercial Pet Breeders and Animal Shelter Licensing Act; repealer. Effective date.
Title
Animals; which relates to the Commercial Pet Breeders and Animal Shelter Licensing Act; repealer. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Dahm |
2023-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture |
2023-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (principal House author) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Alvord |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB349 (Carry Over) 2023-04-11 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Dahm