OK SB28 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State purchasing; modifying requirements for the State Purchasing Director.
Title
State purchasing; modifying requirements for the State Purchasing Director.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 46 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/02/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-03-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-03-30 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 23; Ayes: 46 Nays: 38 |
2015-03-30 | House | General Order |
2015-03-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-02-02 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |