OK SB1921 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - SCs named Rosino, Pugh, Seifried, Pemberton, Hicks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - SCs named Rosino, Pugh, Seifried, Pemberton, Hicks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring certain school personnel to complete certain training; requiring public schools to develop a cardiac emergency response plan. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring certain school personnel to complete certain training; requiring public schools to develop a cardiac emergency response plan. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Bob Culver [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] |
Sen. Brenda Stanley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | SCs named Rosino, Pugh, Seifried, Pemberton, Hicks |
2024-04-16 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2024-04-09 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 1 |
2024-04-08 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-08 | House | Title stricken |
2024-04-08 | House | Amended |
2024-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2024-04-08 | House | General Order |
2024-04-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill |
2024-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2024-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanley |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Culver (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |