OK SB1907 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Attorney General; requiring certain service to the Attorney General. Effective date.
Title
Attorney General; requiring certain service to the Attorney General. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House: General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | Motion expired |
2014-04-16 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Biggs |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 46 |
2014-04-16 | House | General Order |
2014-04-02 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sharp |
2014-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Biggs (principal House author) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |