OK SB1835 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Coauthored by Representative McDugle
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Coauthored by Representative McDugle
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sentencing; creating the Oklahoma Survivors' Act; sentencing and pleas; codification.
Title
Sentencing; creating the Oklahoma Survivors' Act; sentencing and pleas; codification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle |
2024-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-22 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2024-04-22 | House | Emergency removed |
2024-04-22 | House | Title restored |
2024-04-22 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-04-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck |
2024-04-22 | House | General Order |
2024-04-10 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-10 | House | Title stricken |
2024-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2024-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Gollihare |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |