OK SB1741 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle storage rates; providing for consensual towed vehicles; modifying rates. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicle storage rates; providing for consensual towed vehicles; modifying rates. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2024-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |