OK SB173 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Firearms; concealed handgun definition; authorizing private property owners to prohibit certain conduct; requiring signage; immunity from certain liability. Effective date
Title
Firearms; concealed handgun definition; authorizing private property owners to prohibit certain conduct; requiring signage; immunity from certain liability. Effective date
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Newell [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Rep. Mark McCullough [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Mike Christian [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 42) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 55) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 62) [FAIL]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 42) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 55) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 62) [FAIL]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-24 | House | Ayes: 58 Nays: 1 |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR considered |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-20 | Senate | coauthored by David |
2013-05-16 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-16 | Senate | coauthored by Christian |
2013-05-07 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2013-05-06 | Senate | SCs named Griffin, Barrington, David, Treat, Paddack, Sparks |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-22 | Senate | coauthored by Ritze |
2013-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-18 | House | Amended |
2013-04-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Kern, Sherrer, McCullough |
2013-04-18 | House | General Order |
2013-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-28 | Senate | coauthored by Dahm |
2013-02-25 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Newell (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Business and Economic Development
Civil and Criminal Procedure and Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Property
Public Safety
Civil and Criminal Procedure and Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Property
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1289 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |