OK SB1709 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Human Services; transferring certain offices to the State Department of Health. Effective date.
Title
Department of Human Services; transferring certain offices to the State Department of Health. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. George Burns [R] | Rep. Stan May [R] |
Rep. Tammy Townley [R] | Rep. Ross Ford [R] | Sen. Roland Pederson [R] | Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/23/2024 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative May |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Townley |
2024-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 30 |
2024-04-25 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns, Ford |
2024-04-25 | House | General Order |
2024-04-25 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |