OK SB1649 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Vetoed 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Vetoed 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Attorney General; adding certain duties for Office of Attorney General. Emergency.
Title
Attorney General; adding certain duties for Office of Attorney General. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Vetoed 04/22/2024 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-15 | House | General Order |
2024-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2024-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Gollihare |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |