OK SB1520 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Juvenile records; allowing certain schools to access certain records. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Juvenile records; allowing certain schools to access certain records. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-08 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-07 | House | Amended |
2014-04-07 | House | House Rule suspended |
2014-04-07 | House | General Order |
2014-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by McCall (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garrison |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |