OK SB1450 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Nursing homes; requiring facilities to conduct exit conferences for certain violations. Effective date.
Title
Nursing homes; requiring facilities to conduct exit conferences for certain violations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Long-term Care and Senior Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Long-term Care and Senior Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 11 |
2014-04-23 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Long-term Care and Senior Services Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Long-term Care and Senior Services |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |