OK SB1435 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Aeronautics and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Aeronautics and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Turnpikes; clarifying legislative intent; prohibiting turnpike projects without certain approval; requiring special elections for approval of turnpike projects. Effective date.
Title
Turnpikes; clarifying legislative intent; prohibiting turnpike projects without certain approval; requiring special elections for approval of turnpike projects. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jett |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |