OK SB1392 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Uninsured Vehicle Enforcement Diversion Program; modifying certain elements of program. Effective date.
Title
Uninsured Vehicle Enforcement Diversion Program; modifying certain elements of program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Ross Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2024-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 4 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |