OK SB1371 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Unlawful proceeds; modifying what certain unlawful acts are derived from; definition, penalties, certain actions and proceedings.
Title
Unlawful proceeds; modifying what certain unlawful acts are derived from; definition, penalties, certain actions and proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2014-05-05 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2; Ayes: 63 Nays: 22 |
2014-04-23 | House | General Order |
2014-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Biggs (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |