OK SB1265 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles size, weight and load; adding certain exception. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles size, weight and load; adding certain exception. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Rep. Dale DeWitt [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] |
Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-16 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Sanders and substitute with Representative Armes |
2014-05-05 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCs named Schulz, Barrington, Justice, Fields, Wyrick, Sparks |
2014-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-23 | Senate | coauthored by Justice |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Justice; authored by Schulz |
2014-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-22 | House | Title stricken |
2014-04-22 | House | Amended |
2014-04-22 | House | General Order |
2014-04-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) DeWitt, Biggs |
2014-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Marlatt |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Sanders (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Justice |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |