OK SB1082 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1082
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
County officers; prohibiting third parties from assigning themselves as a beneficiary to certain monies held by a county treasurer. Effective date.
Title
County officers; prohibiting third parties from assigning themselves as a beneficiary to certain monies held by a county treasurer. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Shane Jett [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jett |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1082 (Carry Over) 2023-02-21 - Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)