OK SB1001 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Schools; creating the Parent Empowerment Act; creating guidelines for petition circulation. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; creating the Parent Empowerment Act; creating guidelines for petition circulation. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-06 - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-14HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2013-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2013-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2013-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-03-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 12
2013-03-06Senatecoauthored by Loveless, Shortey
2013-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-02-25SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2013-02-18SenateReferred to Education
2013-02-18SenateWithdrawn from Rules committee
2013-02-05Senatecoauthored by Nelson (principal House author)
2013-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2013-02-04Senatecoauthored by Shumate
2013-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Holt
2013-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
703132New CodeSee Bill Text
703146Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback