OK HJR1092 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Constitution; school bond issues for secure facilities; indebtedness; ballot title; filing.
Title
Oklahoma Constitution; school bond issues for secure facilities; indebtedness; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Motion expired |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Sykes |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 25 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-23 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 39 |
2014-05-22 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 57 Nays: 30 |
2014-05-22 | House | Ayes: 27 Nays: 58 |
2014-05-22 | House | Motion to table reconsideration failed |
2014-05-22 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Echols |
2014-05-22 | House | Measure failed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 61 |
2014-05-22 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-22 | House | Laid over |
2014-05-22 | House | CCR considered |
2014-05-20 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Sykes, Griffin, Treat, Sharp, Sparks, Ivester |
2014-05-05 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2014-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-02 | Senate | coauthored by Sharp |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 28 |
2014-03-13 | House | Amended |
2014-03-13 | House | Remove Senator Treat as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Sykes |
2014-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wesselhoft |
2014-03-13 | House | General Order |
2014-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner |
2014-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McBride, Echols |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |