OK HJR1067 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-24 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-24 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology; distribution.
Title
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology; distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-05-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-05-24 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2013-05-24 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Floyd |
2013-05-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 31 |
2013-05-24 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2013-05-24 | House | General Order |
2013-05-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2013-04-30 | House | Authored by Representative Floyd |
2013-04-30 | House | First Reading |