OK HJR1006 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; guaranteeing the right to engage in certain farming and ranching practices; ballot title; filing.
Title
Constitutional amendment; guaranteeing the right to engage in certain farming and ranching practices; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Fields, Griffin, Schulz, Dahm, Burrage, Wyrick |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2014-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-04-14 | Senate | coauthored by Brecheen |
2014-04-10 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2014-04-03 | Senate | coauthored by Loveless |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6 |
2014-03-11 | House | Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McPeak, Hulbert, Johnson, Sanders, Smalley, Echols, Jackson, McNiel, Armes, McBride, Newell, McDaniel (Curtis), Lockhart, Cockroft, Denney, DeWitt, ODonnell, Osborn, McCall, Casey, Sherrer, Martin (Steve), Russ, Blackwell, Ortega |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2013-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |