OK HB3763 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Burn bans; fire departments; county officials; signage; Oklahoma Department of Transportation; effective date.
Title
Burn bans; fire departments; county officials; signage; Oklahoma Department of Transportation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2024 |
2024-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation |
2024-02-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Stewart (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-26 | House | General Order |
2024-02-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims |
2024-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Cantrell |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |