OK HB3632 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle insurance;creating the Uninsured Motor Vehicle Non-Payout Policy Act; uninsured motor vehicle; insurance claims; eligibility; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicle insurance;creating the Uninsured Motor Vehicle Non-Payout Policy Act; uninsured motor vehicle; insurance claims; eligibility; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 23 |
2024-03-12 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative McDugle |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |