OK HB3516 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State Department of Health; exemption to certain appropriations; effective date; emergency.
Title
State Department of Health; exemption to certain appropriations; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2014-05-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-05-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-20 | House | JCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | General Order |
2014-05-19 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2014-05-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2014-05-13 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Justice |
2014-05-13 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2014-05-13 | House | Authored by Representative Martin (Scott), Sears |
2014-05-13 | House | First Reading |