OK HB3511 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; Oklahoma Central Purchasing Act; modifying provisions related to use of state purchasing card.
Title
State government; Oklahoma Central Purchasing Act; modifying provisions related to use of state purchasing card.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2014-05-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 11; Ayes: 59 Nays: 20 |
2014-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey |
2014-05-15 | House | General Order |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2014-05-12 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2014-05-12 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2014-05-12 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 85 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |