OK HB3403 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Requiring Board of Health to adopt or amend certain rules; effective date.
Title
Requiring Board of Health to adopt or amend certain rules; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | Referred to Public Health Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Kern |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |