OK HB3394 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; relating to the unlawful removal of objects from a disaster area; scope of crime; penalty; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; relating to the unlawful removal of objects from a disaster area; scope of crime; penalty; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Brooks [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs |
2014-05-20 | House | Remove Representative Biggs as principal House author and substitute with Representative McBride |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Brooks, Barrington, McAffrey, Loveless, Brinkley, Paddack |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Allen |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-06 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |