OK HB3388 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred for engrossment
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred for engrossment
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credits: prohibiting claims for deduction from certain tax credit; providing exemption for certain tax credits received; parental choice tax credits, modifying income limitations; allowing certain credit to qualifying students; establishing credit amount for certain private schools; emergency.
Title
Income tax credits: prohibiting claims for deduction from certain tax credit; providing exemption for certain tax credits received; parental choice tax credits, modifying income limitations; allowing certain credit to qualifying students; establishing credit amount for certain private schools; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 16 |
2024-03-13 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |