OK HB3385 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; providing for accrual of annual leave in lieu of compensation for eligible employees; providing procedures; specifying accrual limitations; relating to certain life insurance benefits. Emergency.
Title
State government; providing for accrual of annual leave in lieu of compensation for eligible employees; providing procedures; specifying accrual limitations; relating to certain life insurance benefits. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Mike Christian [R] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] |
Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Rep. Randy Terrill [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-28 | Title restored | |
2010-05-28 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Terrill, Miller, Martin (Scott), Christian, Billy, Inman, Lamons, Morrissette | |
2010-04-28 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-21 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-15 | SA's received | |
2010-04-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-14 | coauthored by Garrison | |
2010-04-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-29 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 3 | |
2010-03-11 | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Christian, Billy | |
2010-03-11 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Emergency added | |
2010-02-25 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Terrill | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 1316 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 3A | New Code | See Bill Text |