OK HB3368 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Property; creating the Vehicle Condition Disclosure Act; effective date.
Title
Property; creating the Vehicle Condition Disclosure Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |