OK HB3217 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; relating to the State Auditor and Inspector; modifying petition audits; effective date.
Title
State government; relating to the State Auditor and Inspector; modifying petition audits; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2 |
2014-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |