OK HB3213 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; directing the Department of Corrections to seek additional request for proposals under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; directing the Department of Corrections to seek additional request for proposals under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2014-05-08 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |