OK HB3118 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; property improvements; fair cash value; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; property improvements; fair cash value; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | Title stricken |
2014-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |