OK HB2998 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Open records; requiring certain records to be considered as public records; permitting court to seal a record in certain instance; effective date.
Title
Open records; requiring certain records to be considered as public records; permitting court to seal a record in certain instance; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Stiles |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 32 | 1A | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 24A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 24A | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |