OK HB2972 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legal tender; cash; private organizations and associations; activity; contest; fees and discounts; definition; effective date; emergency.
Title
Legal tender; cash; private organizations and associations; activity; contest; fees and discounts; definition; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick West [R] | Rep. Ty Burns [R] | Rep. John Talley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2024-03-14 | House | Amended |
2024-03-14 | House | General Order |
2024-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Burns (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley |
2024-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative West (Rick) |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |