OK HB2900 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cedar trees; moving administration and support of the Eastern Red Cedar Registry Board; creating the Oklahoma Resource Reclamation Act; recodification; effective date; emergenc
Title
Cedar trees; moving administration and support of the Eastern Red Cedar Registry Board; creating the Oklahoma Resource Reclamation Act; recodification; effective date; emergenc
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Committee Meeting: R DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Agriculture and Rural Development committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 12 |
2014-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2014-03-13 | House | Amended |
2014-03-13 | House | House Rule suspended |
2014-03-13 | House | General Order |
2014-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Wyrick (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Morrissette |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Agriculture
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Government
Natural Resources
Popular Name Laws
Property
Revenue and Taxation
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Government
Natural Resources
Popular Name Laws
Property
Revenue and Taxation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 18 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 403 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 405 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 407 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
68 | 2902 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5059 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5059 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 44D | New Code | See Bill Text |