OK HB2888 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - 2 CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - 2 CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; relating to employees benefit plan requirements; prohibiting Employee Benefits Council from allowing the use of certain funds for abortions or abortion-related services. Effective date.
Title
State government; relating to employees benefit plan requirements; prohibiting Employee Benefits Council from allowing the use of certain funds for abortions or abortion-related services. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-19 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-17 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-12 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-12 | Title restored | |
2010-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | Conference granted, SCs named Aldridge, Brown, Coffee, Lamb, Leftwich | |
2010-04-28 | HC's named: Moore, Martin (Scott), Murphey, Osborn, Pittman, Scott, Shannon | |
2010-04-21 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-13 | SA's received | |
2010-04-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-12 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-12 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-29 | Remove as author Senator Brown; authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2010-03-29 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-24 | Pending removal author Senator Brown and replace with Senator Aldridge | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 9 | |
2010-03-11 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-11 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-11 | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-11 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Moore | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 1301 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1304 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1308 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1315 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1370 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1371 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1375 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1383 | New Code | See Bill Text |